U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20388
  • Case Name: Joshua J. White and Jessica A. White
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Avoid or strip Lien]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Avoid or Strip Lien]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Withdraw Document]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Entry]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Avoid or Strip Lien]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.