U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10399
  • Case Name: Ernest Sheldon Boykin, Jr. and Brenda Gloria Boykin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Chapter 07/11/13 Meeting of Creditors Continued]
July, 2018
  • July 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.