U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10398
  • Case Name: Millard R. Perkins and Norma A. Perkins
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Entry]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • July 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Matrix]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.