U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10394
  • Case Name: Rodney S. Blaisdell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismissing Case]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
  • February 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Drop Dead Order]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdrawal as Attorney]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
September, 2018
  • September 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdraw Document]
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Installment Payment (Final) (Chapter 13)]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Installment Payment #3 (Chapter 13)]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Filing Fee Payment]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order Missed Installment Fee]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Installment Payment #2 (Chapter 13)]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Installment Payment #1 (Chapter 13)]
  • July 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order Missed Installment Fee]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.