U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00342
  • Case Name: Lee, Jr. v. New Orleans Public Belt Railroad Commission for the Port of New Orleans et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Expedite]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 07, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 07, 2025: [Witness and Exhibit List]
  • April 01, 2025: [Compel]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.