U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00229-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holmes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Trial Exhibit List ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Jury Verdict Form]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 03, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Pretrial Memorandum ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Pretrial Memorandum ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 17, 2025: [Proposed Jury Verdict Form]
  • March 17, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Enroll as Counsel of Record]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Superseding Indictment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • March 10, 2025: [Objections]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.