U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Waid
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Further Proceedings Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Further Proceedings Hearing]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 27, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 27, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 26, 2022: [Bond]
  • October 17, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 12, 2022: [Sealed Document - Court User Only]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 12, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • October 12, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.