U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smithers, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Statement of Reason]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Status Report]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 27, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 27, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.