U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00039-2
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 09, 2023: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [Arrest]
  • January 06, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2023: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 04, 2023: [Sealed Order - Revocation]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [USP Status - No Action]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
  • October 18, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 27, 2022: [Waiver]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 27, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 27, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 27, 2022: [Arrest]
  • September 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Bond]
  • September 20, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 19, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 19, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.