U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCrary
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 21, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
  • January 13, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Speedy Trial Excludable Stop]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 06, 2023: [Suppress]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 17, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 15, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 12, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 12, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.