U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramsey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Further Proceedings Hearing]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 29, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 28, 2022: [Arrest]
  • December 28, 2022: [Waiver]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum (Application)]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 14, 2021: [Sealed Document - Court User Only]
  • July 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 14, 2021: [Case Assignment]
  • July 14, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.