U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mudd
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 27, 2022: [Statement of Reason]
  • May 26, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 26, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 24, 2022: [Waiver]
  • May 23, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • July 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 09, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 07, 2021: [Sealed Supplemental Plea Agreement]
  • July 07, 2021: [Bond]
  • July 07, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 02, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 02, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • July 02, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • July 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 02, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Schedules]
  • May 18, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 18, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 18, 2021: [Case Assignment]
  • May 18, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.