U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grant et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 13, 2023: [Statement of Reason]
  • January 12, 2023: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 12, 2023: [Acknowledgement of Waiver of Appeal Rights]
  • January 11, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 10, 2023: [Sentencing]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 11, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 02, 2022: [Sealed Supplemental Plea Agreement]
  • September 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 11, 2022: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • August 10, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 10, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 01, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 29, 2022: [Disclosure]
  • July 25, 2022: [In Limine]
  • July 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 25, 2022: [Exclude]
  • July 22, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 22, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • July 21, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • July 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 02, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 01, 2022: [Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
  • June 09, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 09, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 06, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 06, 2022: [Adopt]
  • June 03, 2022: [Sever Defendant]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • May 31, 2022: [Suppression Hearing]
  • May 27, 2022: [Suppress]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [USP Status - No Action]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 16, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Adopt]
  • February 04, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
  • February 04, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 21, 2022: [Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Suppress]
  • January 06, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 06, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
  • December 09, 2021: [Status Conference]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 25, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
  • October 25, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 13, 2021: [Status Conference]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 02, 2021: [Bill of Particulars]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
  • August 30, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 20, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 17, 2021: [Suppress]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Transcript - Court Official]
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of Filing Official Transcript]
  • June 29, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 24, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
  • June 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 14, 2021: [Revoke]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [Arraignment]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • May 26, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 24, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Referring Motion - TEXT ONLY]
  • May 19, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 12, 2021: [Schedules]
  • May 12, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 11, 2021: [Sealed Document - Court User Only]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 11, 2021: [Case Assignment]
  • May 11, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.