U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-02025
  • Case Name: Branson et al v. Shawnee County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 16, 2025: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • March 24, 2025: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 24, 2025: [Withdraw]
  • March 21, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 21, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 20, 2025: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 14, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.