U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cr-20024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Delgado-Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 17, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Petition and Order to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • April 25, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 25, 2018: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge with Guilty Plea]
  • April 25, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 20, 2018: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea (to court)]
  • April 19, 2018: [Detention]
  • April 19, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 19, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 19, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 13, 2018: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 13, 2018: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • April 13, 2018: [~Util - Interpreter Needed]
  • April 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • April 13, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 13, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 13, 2018: [Arrest]
  • April 12, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.