U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cr-20011-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Miranda-Trujillo et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Defendant]
  • January 02, 2020: [Dismiss Defendant]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 19, 2019: [SEALED Motion]
  • February 19, 2019: [SEALED Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal]
  • February 15, 2019: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • February 14, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - Public]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 07, 2019: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 13, 2018: [Petition and Order to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • November 13, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea (to court)]
  • October 12, 2018: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • September 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 04, 2018: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 03, 2018: [Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Continue]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Pretrial and Criminal Case Management Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 25, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 25, 2018: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • April 23, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 13, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 12, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 11, 2018: [Arrest]
  • April 11, 2018: [Notice of Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.