U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:17-cr-10059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hayes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Appointing Public Defender]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 24, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Service by Publication]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 14, 2018: [Revocation Judgment]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • November 14, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 13, 2018: [Notice of Docket Text Modification]
  • November 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 06, 2018: [Revoke]
  • November 06, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 05, 2018: [Detention]
  • November 05, 2018: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • November 05, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 05, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2018: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • November 02, 2018: [Violation Report]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Prob 12C SEALED Petition for Warrant or Summons for Offender Under Supervision]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Reassigning Case]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 05, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 02, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 02, 2018: [Supplement]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Exhibits]
  • February 23, 2018: [Downward Departure]
  • February 20, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 22, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 22, 2018: [Bond]
  • January 22, 2018: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 17, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • January 17, 2018: [Review]
  • January 08, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2017: [PS8 SEALED Petition for Actions on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 08, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 02, 2017: [Petition and Order to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • November 02, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea (to court)]
  • October 27, 2017: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 08, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 06, 2017: [Exhibits in Support of Motion]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Conventionally]
  • September 05, 2017: [Leave to File Conventionally]
  • September 05, 2017: [Hearing]
  • September 05, 2017: [Suppress]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 06, 2017: [Continue]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Status Conference]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2017: [Bond]
  • May 17, 2017: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 17, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 15, 2017: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • May 15, 2017: [Detention]
  • May 15, 2017: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • May 15, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 15, 2017: [Arrest]
  • May 15, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 15, 2017: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.