U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cr-20010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 18, 2018: [SEALED Motion]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal]
  • June 18, 2018: [Leave to File Under Seal]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • March 19, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 12, 2017: [Petition and Order to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • December 11, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice of Continuance of Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
  • August 09, 2017: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea (to court)]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [Continue]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 06, 2017: [Continue]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Pretrial and Criminal Case Management Order]
  • April 28, 2017: [Detention]
  • April 28, 2017: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 28, 2017: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 28, 2017: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • April 28, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • April 28, 2017: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • April 28, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2017: [Arrest]
  • April 26, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 13, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.