U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-at-02025
  • Case Name: In Re: Attorney Annual Renewal Fees
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Brief /Other]
  • April 14, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 11, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 10, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 09, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 09, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 07, 2025: [Brief /Other]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Brief /Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.