U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-mc-00006
  • Case Name: In Re: IASD Prisoner/Pro Se Filings
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Prisoner/Pro Se Correspondence]
  • April 11, 2025: [Prisoner/Pro Se Correspondence]
  • April 10, 2025: [Prisoner/Pro Se Correspondence]
  • April 07, 2025: [Prisoner/Pro Se Correspondence]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Prisoner/Pro Se Correspondence]
  • March 28, 2025: [Prisoner/Pro Se Correspondence]
  • March 27, 2025: [Prisoner/Pro Se Correspondence]
  • March 25, 2025: [Prisoner/Pro Se Correspondence]
  • March 24, 2025: [Prisoner/Pro Se Correspondence]
  • March 21, 2025: [Prisoner/Pro Se Correspondence]
  • March 19, 2025: [Prisoner/Pro Se Correspondence]
  • March 18, 2025: [Prisoner/Pro Se Correspondence]
  • March 17, 2025: [Prisoner/Pro Se Correspondence]
  • March 13, 2025: [Prisoner/Pro Se Correspondence]
  • March 12, 2025: [Prisoner/Pro Se Correspondence]
  • March 11, 2025: [Prisoner/Pro Se Correspondence]
January, 2025
  • January 20, 2025: [Prisoner/Pro Se Correspondence]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Prisoner/Pro Se Correspondence]
  • October 01, 2024: [Prisoner/Pro Se Correspondence]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Prisoner/Pro Se Correspondence]
  • September 26, 2024: [Prisoner/Pro Se Correspondence]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.