U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-02055
  • Case Name: Gruber v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 09, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • August 05, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.