U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00219
  • Case Name: Klein v. Montezuma Community School District et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 15, 2022: [Stipulation]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • November 10, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • November 10, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 09, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 09, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 11, 2022: [Status Report]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Status Report]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Status Report]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 12, 2022: [Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 04, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • February 04, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 03, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order]
  • December 28, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 28, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 20, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 13, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 29, 2021: [Dismiss]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Reply]
  • September 01, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.