U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-mj-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stanton
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Stipulated Discovery and Protective Order]
  • April 08, 2020: [Proposed Stipulated Discovery and Protective Order]
  • April 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Bail/Bond Report (Sealed )]
  • February 20, 2020: [Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed]
  • February 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 20, 2020: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 20, 2020: [Detention]
  • February 20, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 20, 2020: [NOTICE: Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
  • February 20, 2020: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • February 20, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [Arrest]
  • February 20, 2020: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • February 20, 2020: [Complaint]
  • February 20, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.