U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kelly, Jr.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Exhibit(s)]
  • January 27, 2020: [Exhibits Receipt]
  • January 27, 2020: [Detention]
  • January 27, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 27, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 27, 2020: [Bail/Bond Report (Sealed )]
  • January 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 22, 2020: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • January 22, 2020: [Detention]
  • January 22, 2020: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • January 22, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 22, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 22, 2020: [Arrest]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order]
  • January 21, 2020: [Complaint]
  • January 21, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.