U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00156
  • Case Name: Morris et al v. Arshdeep et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Disclosure]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Statement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 08, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 07, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 04, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 04, 2025: [State Court Complaint]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.