U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-80527--13
  • Case Name: John Phillip Thompson, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Wage Assignment Order Amended]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Minute Entry/Order Vacated]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Certificate of Service re: Plan Notice (Ch 13 Only)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Plan Notice - Debtor or Trustee Distribution (Ch 13)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Chapter 13 Plan - Amended (Pre-Confirmation ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.