U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00276
  • Case Name: RANDOLPH v. GREENCROFT COMMUNITIES FOUNDATION INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 31, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.