U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00519
  • Case Name: MALLORQUI-RUSCALLEDA v. THE TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY - PURDUE UNIVERSITY INDIANAPOLIS
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 09, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Motion (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Reply in Support of Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Response]
  • March 28, 2025: [Submission]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Leave to File]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 21, 2025: [Leave to File]
  • March 20, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • March 20, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.