U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-00073
  • Case Name: Vandergraff v. Trigo Quality Solutions US, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Protective Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 28, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 28, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 26, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • March 20, 2025: [Substitute Party]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.