U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00069
  • Case Name: Bailey v. Indiana State Prison et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 17, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.