U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00412
  • Case Name: PHILLIPS v. FAWVER et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Additional Recruited Counsel Pursuant to LR 87]
  • April 24, 2025: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appoint Additional Recruited Counsel Pursuant to LR 87]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [SCHEDULING Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.