U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01008
  • Case Name: Rieth-Riley Construction Co., Inc. v. Allied World National Assurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 31, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 28, 2025: [Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 19, 2025: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.