U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00238
  • Case Name: Rodriguez v. Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order to Show Cause - Habeas Corpus]
  • April 04, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 19, 2025: [Docket Annotation - public event with NEF]
  • March 19, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 19, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - court user]
  • March 19, 2025: [Consent to Prisoner E-Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.