U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00188-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KAMAU
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 19, 2025: [Motion (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Entry]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Seal a Document (Motion to Seal or Motion to Maintain Under Seal)]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 07, 2024: [Dismiss]
  • October 04, 2024: [Information Pursuant to 21:851(A)(1) - Prior Felony]
  • October 04, 2024: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 04, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Waiver of Detention]
  • January 13, 2023: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [NGPL (Not guilty plea)]
  • January 13, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • January 12, 2023: [Scheduling of Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Readiness for Initial Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.