U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Inestroza-Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 10, 2023: [PSR - Addendum to Final (with Padlock)]
  • January 10, 2023: [PSR - Final (with Padlock)]
  • January 06, 2023: [PSR - No Objection to Draft]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 23, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 22, 2022: [PSR - Draft (with Padlock)]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 08, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 07, 2022: [Waiver of Minimum Time to Trial]
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 09, 2022: [Pretrial Bond Report]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 22, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 22, 2022: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • July 13, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.