U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Diaz et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Consent to Rule 11 Plea in a Felony Case]
  • January 12, 2023: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 11, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 09, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 09, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 06, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Opinion and Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Referring Plea Agreement to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 18, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 15, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 01, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • October 31, 2022: [Suppress]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 09, 2022: [Opinion and Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 02, 2022: [Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 27, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • June 22, 2022: [Detain]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • June 22, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.