U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00121
  • Case Name: Oravetz v. Federal Reserve of San Francisco
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 07, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 31, 2025: [Supplement]
  • March 31, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 27, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.