U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00285-
  • Case Name: Eladio A. Rodriguez and Brynn M. Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Approving Trustee's Report of No Distribution and Closing Case]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Approving Trustee's Report of No Distribution and Closing Case (No Asset)]
October, 2022
  • October 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Discharging Debtor Ch.7]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • July 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • July 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
  • July 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.