U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00263-
  • Case Name: Sherry Lynn Bailey
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Approving Trustee's Report of No Distribution and Closing Case]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Approving Trustee's Report of No Distribution and Closing Case (No Asset)]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Discharging Debtor Ch.7]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order regarding Application To Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Pay Filing Fees in Installment]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Installments]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.