U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00114-
  • Case Name: Tori Jo Baird
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Assets]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • November 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Employ]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Employ (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner)]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor(s)]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • March 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • March 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
  • March 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.