U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40089-
  • Case Name: Justin Robert Rausch
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Approving Trustee's Report of No Distribution and Closing Case]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Approving Trustee's Report of No Distribution and Closing Case (No Asset)]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Automatic Discharge of Debtor(s)]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • March 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • March 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
  • March 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hopkins, R Sam [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.