U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40083-
  • Case Name: Rocky Mountain Orthopedic & Regenerative Medicine
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 21, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • January 21, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Compensation]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
December, 2022
  • December 18, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Order on Pro Hac Vice Application]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Application for Compensation]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Order on Pro Hac Vice Application]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Employ]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
  • November 20, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • November 18, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Employ]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Objection]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Employ (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner)]
  • October 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Employ (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner)]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Order on Pro Hac Vice Application]
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Employ (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner)]
  • September 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Assets]
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Employ]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Employ (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner)]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing]
  • July 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Relief from Stay]
  • July 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Relief Ch.7 (Involuntary case)]
  • June 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
  • June 06, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Summons Issued - Involuntary Case]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Summons Issued - Involuntary Case]
  • March 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice of Additional Missing Documents]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.