U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00085-
  • Case Name: Lisa Diane Cracchiolo
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Approving Trustee's Report of No Distribution and Closing Case]
  • June 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Approving Trustee's Report of No Distribution and Closing Case (No Asset)]
  • June 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Discharging Debtor Ch.7]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • May 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order regarding Ch.7 Filing Fee Waiver Application]
  • March 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • March 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Order on Application to Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • March 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • March 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • March 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.