U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mj-00278-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kanoa
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [3 - Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 14, 2025: [2 - Set Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • April 09, 2025: [1 - Terminate Motions]
  • April 08, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • April 07, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 04, 2025: [3 - Speedy Trial - Procedural Interval Start]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.