U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00628
  • Case Name: Jamie Kuuipo Zane Kubota and Shanon Kawehiokalani Kubota
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Stipulated Order]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Valuation of Secured Claim (CM27)]
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.