U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00168
  • Case Name: Louise Antoinette Lehu Pinheiro
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Cover Sheet]
  • April 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Certification/Certificate of Debtor Education (Form 423 or actual certificate)]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Certification/Certificate of Debtor Education (Form 423 or actual certificate)]
  • March 01, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Statement of Intention [Official Form B108]]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Request for Notice]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Granting Application for Ch 7 Fee Waiver]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Application)]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kane, Elizabeth A [1 Ch 7 Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.