U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-00161
  • Case Name: Lovelyn Aloha Lokomaika Harrison and Duane Ikaika Harrison
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 20, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Additional Fees]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Declaration and Request for Entry of Order]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Additional Fees]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Declaration and Request for Entry of Order]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Withdrawal of Motion, Objection, or Other Document (Text Entry - No PDF)]
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • October 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Application for Compensation by Debtor's Attorney]
  • October 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Modify Confirmed Plan (Order)]
  • October 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Declaration and Request for Entry of Order]
  • October 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Withdrawal of Motion, Objection, or Other Document (Text Entry - No PDF)]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Certificate of Service]
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Modify Confirmed Plan (Motion)]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Ch 13 - Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
  • April 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Notice - No PDF (batch)]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Notice]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [4 Certificate of Service - Chapter 13 Plan]
  • February 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Request for Notice]
  • February 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.