U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-01175
  • Case Name: Chayse Deacon Kapili Tagalog
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 08, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [4 Certificate of Service - Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.