U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-01176
  • Case Name: Lori Ann Duchess Wilson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Declaration and Request for Entry of Order]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Request for Notice (batch)]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (Motion) (FEE 181)]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Request for Notice]
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Yanagi, Richard A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.