U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Hawaii

hawaii Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Hawaii
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-01174
  • Case Name: Rexcie Mendoza Afaga
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Errata]
  • February 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Schedules A-J (Amended)]
  • February 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Convert Ch 13 Case to Ch 7 (Debtor's Motion or Notice)]
  • February 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Dane S. [Convert Ch 13 Case to Ch 7 - Debtor's Motion or Notice (FEE 25)]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ghazvini, Nima [Stipulated Order]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
  • February 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Withdrawal of Motion, Objection, or Other Document (Text Entry - No PDF)]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Service]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Stipulated Order]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Stipulation]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Stipulated Order]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [4 Certificate of Service - Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hu, Howard M.S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.